NY S08431 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that nuisance wildlife control operators disclose to the client, in writing, that euthanasia may be used to resolve a wildlife related problem.
Title
Requires that nuisance wildlife control operators disclose to the client, in writing, that euthanasia may be used to resolve a wildlife related problem.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.818 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09945 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - referred to environmental conservation