NY S08475 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of New Castle to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Ethical Society of Northern Westchester; provides a waiver for any interest and penalties accrued in the event that the authorization to exempt is not timely granted.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of New Castle to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Ethical Society of Northern Westchester; provides a waiver for any interest and penalties accrued in the event that the authorization to exempt is not timely granted.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.470 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08430 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation