NY S08624 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to reissue a commercial food fish license, commercial crab permit, and commercial whelk permit to Todd Wolffert from West Islip, NY.
Title
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to reissue a commercial food fish license, commercial crab permit, and commercial whelk permit to Todd Wolffert from West Islip, NY.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1614 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10751 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - referred to environmental conservation