NY S08639 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to standardized test administration; increases penalty for violations to one thousand dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to standardized test administration; increases penalty for violations to one thousand dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.351
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.204
2018-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a11022a
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1803
2018-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 8639C
2018-06-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-05-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 8639B
2018-05-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 8639A
2018-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A11022 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8639c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08639
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08639A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08639B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08639C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8639#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8639#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08639&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback