NY S08639 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to review claims for expenditures for early and periodic screening, diagnosis and treatment and other health services, care and supplies which are furnished to eligible children and pre-school children regardless of whether such children have handicapping conditions, are suspected of having handicapping conditions or have an individualized education plan; requires the department of health to apply for all necessary federal approvals regarding such expenditures.
Title
Requires the department of health to review claims for expenditures for early and periodic screening, diagnosis and treatment and other health services, care and supplies which are furnished to eligible children and pre-school children regardless of whether such children have handicapping conditions, are suspected of having handicapping conditions or have an individualized education plan; requires the department of health to apply for all necessary federal approvals regarding such expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09475 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - reported referred to ways and means