NY S08654 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Falls Brook, Jones Brook, Kelso Brook, Minerva Stream, and Trout Brook to the definition of inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Adds Falls Brook, Jones Brook, Kelso Brook, Minerva Stream, and Trout Brook to the definition of inland waterways for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.728 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09496 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - referred to environmental conservation