NY S08675 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services to July 1, 2029.
Title
Extends provisions related to services to out-of-state school districts by boards of cooperative educational services to July 1, 2029.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.676 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09470 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION