NY S08722 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the empire state plaza art commission to examine the historical significance of major rivers in the state of New York in connection with renaming the agency buildings located at the empire state plaza; requires the governor to choose the new agency building names within 60 days after the commission's recommendation.
Title
Requires the empire state plaza art commission to examine the historical significance of major rivers in the state of New York in connection with renaming the agency buildings located at the empire state plaza; requires the governor to choose the new agency building names within 60 days after the commission's recommendation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.743 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09059 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development