NY S08728 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for service of notice of violations of any provision of title sixteen of the administrative code of the city of New York by the department of sanitation on a respondent that is a closed commercial establishment.
Title
Provides for service of notice of violations of any provision of title sixteen of the administrative code of the city of New York by the department of sanitation on a respondent that is a closed commercial establishment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.784 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A09433 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - referred to cities