NY S08742 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Thomas Smith to receive credit under the optional twenty-year retirement plan of the retirement and social security law available to police officers.
Title
Authorizes Thomas Smith to receive credit under the optional twenty-year retirement plan of the retirement and social security law available to police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.266 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1003 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8742 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.283 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.283 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10796 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1003 |
2020-07-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10796 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.266