NY S08763 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Validates certain acts of the North Syracuse central school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects; such projects shall be eligible for state aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validates certain acts of the North Syracuse central school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects; such projects shall be eligible for state aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.1
2018-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.200
2018-08-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.372
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10705
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1624
2018-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-14SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10705 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8763

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback