NY S08784 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of motor vehicles compile a list of veterans who apply for a veteran driver's license and provide such list to the department of veterans' services to aid in outreach efforts by the department of veterans' services.
Title
Requires the department of motor vehicles compile a list of veterans who apply for a veteran driver's license and provide such list to the department of veterans' services to aid in outreach efforts by the department of veterans' services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.671 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |