NY S08833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-24 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-24 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the number of state senators and inclusion of incarcerated persons in the federal census for population determination for redistricting purposes and to the functioning of the independent redistricting commission in the determination of district lines for congressional and state legislative offices.
Title
Relates to the number of state senators and inclusion of incarcerated persons in the federal census for population determination for redistricting purposes and to the functioning of the independent redistricting commission in the determination of district lines for congressional and state legislative offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10839 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1031 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10839 (Same As) 2020-07-24 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE