NY S08839 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assessment, levy and collection of taxes, including school district taxes in the county of Erie; and relates to authorizing and providing for the sale of lands for the nonpayment of taxes, and for the foreclosure of such lands.
Title
Relates to the assessment, levy and collection of taxes, including school district taxes in the county of Erie; and relates to authorizing and providing for the sale of lands for the nonpayment of taxes, and for the foreclosure of such lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1682 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10911 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - print number 10911b