NY S09054 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to annual professional performance reviews of teachers and principals; establishes an optional system of annual professional performance review plans; repeals provisions relating to streamlined removal procedures for teachers rated ineffective.
Title
Relates to annual professional performance reviews of teachers and principals; establishes an optional system of annual professional performance review plans; repeals provisions relating to streamlined removal procedures for teachers rated ineffective.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.828 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09849 (Same As) 2024-04-12 - referred to education