NY S09312 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commercial food fish licenses; extends such licensing for an additional year to 2023.
Title
Relates to commercial food fish licenses; extends such licensing for an additional year to 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10193 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1415 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10193 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - signed chap.760