NY S09365 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10215A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10215A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits third-party restaurant reservation services from arranging unauthorized restaurant reservations with food service establishments; establishes fines for violations of such prohibition.
Title
Prohibits third-party restaurant reservation services from arranging unauthorized restaurant reservations with food service establishments; establishes fines for violations of such prohibition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10215A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1596 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9365A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10215 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY