NY S09367 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the management of migratory game birds to December 31, 2027.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the management of migratory game birds to December 31, 2027.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10074 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1328 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10074 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY