OH HB1 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1.60, 102.01, 102.02, 102.022, 117.01, 121.01, 121.22, 121.41, 121.60, 121.67, 122.011, 124.01, 145.012, 149.011, 2921.01, and 4117.01 and to enact sections 187.01 to 187.12 of the Revised Code to authorize the Governor to form a nonprofit corporation that would perform such state economic development functions as directed by law and pursuant to a contract with the Department of Development, and to make an appropriation.
Title
To authorize the Governor to form a nonprofit corporation that would perform such state economic development functions as directed by law and pursuant to a contract with the Department of Development, and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-01 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Effective Date | |
2011-02-18 | Governor' Action | |
2011-03-01 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-02-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Concurrence | |
2011-02-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-02 | To Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-02-01 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-01-11 | To *Finance & Appropriations | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 02 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 02 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 02 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 21 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 67 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 22 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 24 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 45 | 012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 87 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 87 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 87 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 21 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |