OH HB132 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3772.03 and to enact sections 3774.01, 3774.02, 3774.03, 3774.04, 3774.05, 3774.06, 3774.07, 3774.08, and 3774.09 of the Revised Code to grant the Ohio Casino Control Commission the authority to regulate fantasy contests and to exempt fantasy contests from the gambling laws.
Title
Regulate fantasy contests
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Dever [R] | Rep. Louis Blessing [R] | Rep. Jack Cera [D] | Rep. William Seitz [R] |
Sen. Dave Burke [R] | Sen. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Scott Oelslager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 | |
2017-12-05 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Passed |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-03-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 72 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 74 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 74 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |