OH HB138 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 109.73, 317.08, 959.131, 1717.01, 1717.04, 1717.06, and 1717.09 of the Revised Code to require an individual to file proof of successful completion of training with the county recorder prior to being appointed as a humane society agent and to require the revocation or suspension of an appointment under certain circumstances.
Title
To require an individual to file proof of successful completion of training with the county recorder prior to being appointed as a humane society agent and to require the revocation or suspension of an appointment under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2011-06-09 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-02 | To Local Government | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 17 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 17 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 59 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |