OH HB16 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3333.31 of the Revised Code to grant residency status for in-state college tuition to active duty military service members and their spouses and dependents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant state college residency status to military and dependents

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. John Becker [R]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Ron Hood [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateIntroduced
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseReported - Amended: Higher Education
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Higher Education
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
333331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback