OH HB173 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2410 of the Revised Code to designate the month of May as "Older Ohioans Month."
Title
Designate May as Older Ohioans Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: General Government |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | House | Passed |
2023-11-29 | House | Reported: Families and Aging |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to committee: Families and Aging |
2023-05-16 | House | Introduced |