OH HB179 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2305.15 and to enact section 2307.241 of the Revised Code relative to vicarious liability in tort actions and to provide that the tolling of the limitations period during the defendant's absence or concealment does not apply to statutes of repose.
Title
Regards vicarious liability in tort actions; statutes of repose
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | House | Passed |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred to committee: Civil Justice |
2023-05-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
House Civil Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
House Civil Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 05 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 07 | 241 | New Code | See Bill Text |