OH HB2 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-15 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-15 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 3333.01, 3333.02, 3333.021, 3333.03, 3333.04, 3333.041, 3333.042, 3333.043, 3333.044, 3333.045, 3333.046, 3333.047, 3333.05, 3333.06, 3333.07, 3333.071, 3333.072, 3333.08, 3333.09, 3333.10, 3333.11, 3333.12, 3333.121, 3333.122, 3333.123, 3333.13, 3333.14, 3333.15, 3333.16, 3333.161, 3333.162, 3333.163, 3333.17, 3333.18, 3333.19, 3333.20, 3333.21, 3333.22, 3333.23, 3333.25, 3333.26, 3333.27, 3333.28, 3333.29, 3333.31, 3333.33, 3333.34, 3333.35, 3333.36, 3333.37, 3333.372, 3333.373, 3333.374, 3333.375, and 3333.38 and to enact sections 3333.031 and 3333.032 of the Revised Code to transfer appointment of the Chancellor of the Ohio Board of Regents to the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate, to make the Board of Regents an advisory board to the Chancellor, to transfer the Board's duties and powers to the Chancellor, to shorten the terms of the Board's members, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Regents advisory role - Governor appoints Chancellor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-15 | Effective Date | |
2007-05-15 | Governor Action | |
2007-05-25 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-05-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-05-09 | Concurrence | |
2007-05-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-05-02 | Committee Report | |
2007-03-22 | To Education | |
2007-03-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-03-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-03-21 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To Education | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_2 |