OH HB252 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-24)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-24)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2519 of the Revised Code to designate the month of January as "Blood Donor Awareness Month."
Title
Designate Blood Donor Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Effective 5/11/18 | |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-20 | House | Passed |
2017-09-13 | House | Reported: Health |
2017-06-06 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-05-31 | House | Introduced |