OH HB253 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5534.646 of the Revised Code to designate portions of United States Routes 42, 68, and 62 as the "Brigadier General Charles Young Memorial Historical Corridor."
Title
Designate Brigadier General Charles Young Mem Historical Corridor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | House | Passed |
2023-10-02 | House | Reported: Transportation |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2023-08-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House Transportation Committee
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation