OH HB262 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.21, 4503.571, and 4503.68 and to enact sections 4503.506, 4503.557, 4503.714, 4503.725, 4503.767, 4503.881, 4503.893, 4503.942, and 4503.956 of the Revised Code to create multiple nonstandard license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Folds of Honor license plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-20SenateIntroduced
2019-06-19HousePassed
2019-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-04HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-05-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450121Amended CodeCitation Text
4503New CodeSee Bill Text
4503506New CodeSee Bill Text
4503557New CodeSee Bill Text
4503571Amended CodeCitation Text
450368Amended CodeCitation Text
4503714New CodeSee Bill Text
4503725New CodeSee Bill Text
4503767New CodeSee Bill Text
4503881New CodeSee Bill Text
4503893New CodeSee Bill Text
4503942New CodeSee Bill Text
4503956New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback