OH HB279 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 4509.105 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit certain individuals who do not maintain statutory minimum levels of automobile insurance from collecting noneconomic damages for harm sustained in a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Prohibits noneconomic damages if no auto insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2015-09-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2015-06-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 09 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |