OH HB352 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2151.011, 2151.421, and 5103.02 and to enact sections 5103.50, 5103.51, 5103.52, 5103.53, 5103.54, and 5103.55 of the Revised Code to license private, nonprofit therapeutic wilderness camps.
Title
To license private, nonprofit therapeutic wilderness camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House - Emergency clause failed (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - House - Emergency clause failed (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-03-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-03-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-14 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-11-14 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 01 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 901 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 03 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 03 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 03 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |