OH HB404 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-09-11 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 1321.72, 1321.78, 3916.01 to 3916.03, 3916.05 to 3916.07, 3916.09 to 3916.20, and 3916.99 and to enact sections 3911.021, 3916.031, 3916.171, 3916.172, and 3916.173 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing viatical settlements.
Title
Viatical settlements-change law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-09-11 | Effective Date | |
2008-06-11 | Governor Action | |
2008-06-17 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-06-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-05-29 | Concurrence | |
2008-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2008-01-31 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2008-01-31 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-01-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-01-30 | Committee Report | |
2007-11-29 | To Insurance | |
2007-11-29 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_404 |