OH HB415 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 131.44 and 131.51 and to enact section 131.52 of the Revised Code to allocate one-half of any surplus revenue to a new Local Government Road Improvement Fund, from which money will be distributed to local governments to fund road improvements.
Title
Allocate one-half surplus revenue to local road improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2017-11-28 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-11-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 31 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 31 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 31 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |