OH HB420 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 905.31, 905.40, 905.411, 905.44, 905.50, 905.99, 1533.10, 1533.11, 1533.111, 1533.32, 1533.73, and 1533.731 and to enact section 1531.40 of the Revised Code to require commercial nuisance wild animal control operators that provide nuisance wild animal removal or control services to be licensed by the Chief of the Division of Wildlife, to exempt residents of other states that own land in this state from having to obtain licenses and permits issued by the Division for hunting, trapping, or fishing under specified circumstances, to allow persons to hunt in commercial bird shooting preserves and wild animal hunting preserves without obtaining a hunting license or deer permit, as applicable, and to revise the rulemaking authority of the Director of Agriculture regarding anhydrous ammonia and other fertilizers.
Title
To require commercial nuisance wild animal control operators that provide nuisance wild animal removal or control services to be licensed by the Chief of the Division of Wildlife, to exempt residents of other states that own land in this state from having to obtain licenses and permits issued by the Division for hunting, trapping, or fishing under specified circumstances, to allow persons to hunt in commercial bird shooting preserves and wild animal hunting preserves without obtaining a hunting license or deer permit, as applicable, and to revise the rulemaking authority of the Director of Agriculture regarding anhydrous ammonia and other fertilizers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-11 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-29 | To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources | |
2012-05-29 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-01-24 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
15 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 31 | 40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 31 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 31 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 31 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 33 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
9 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 05 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 05 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 05 | 411 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 05 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 05 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 05 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |