OH HB47 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Referred to committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 755.13, 3313.5310, 3313.6021, 3313.6023, 3313.717, 3314.16, 3326.11, 3328.24, 3701.85, and 3707.58 and to enact section 3701.851 of the Revised Code to require the placement of automated external defibrillators (AEDs) in each public and chartered nonpublic school and each public recreational facility and to require the Ohio Department of Health to develop a model emergency action plan for the use of AEDs.
Title
Require automated external defibrillators (AEDs) in schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2023-06-06 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2023-05-24 | House | Informally passed |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported: Health Provider Services |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to committee: Health Provider Services |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Health Provider Services Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
Public Safety
Senate Health Committee
State and Local Government
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Health Provider Services Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
Public Safety
Senate Health Committee
State and Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 13 | 5310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 6021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 6023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 717 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 851 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 07 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 55 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |