OH HB50 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.41, 2305.42, 2305.43, 2305.44, 2305.45, 2305.48, and 2305.49 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing medical identifying devices and to name this act Paige's Law.
Title
Enact Paige's Law re: medical identifying devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-12-14 | House | Passed |
2022-12-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2021-02-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Public Safety
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 05 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |