OH HB58 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-23 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4511.01, 4511.213, and 4513.17 of the Revised Code to require motor vehicle operators to take certain actions upon approaching a stationary waste collection vehicle collecting refuse on a roadside.
Title
Requires operator caution with waste collection vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Cera [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed |
2015-11-19 | House | Reported: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |