OH HB61 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-11 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43, 1347.08, 2101.16, 2101.162, 2101.24, 3107.071, 3107.081, 3107.082, 3107.083, 3107.09, 3107.091, 3107.141, 3107.17, 3107.18, 3107.19, 3107.38, 3107.45, 3107.66, 3705.07, 3705.08, 3705.12, 3705.23, 3705.241, 3705.29, 5103.151, and 5103.152, to enact new sections 3107.39 and 3107.40 and sections 3107.171, 3705.121, 3705.122, 3705.123, 3705.124, 3705.125, and 3705.126, and to repeal sections 3107.39, 3107.40, 3107.41, 3107.42, 3107.43, and 3107.44 of the Revised Code regarding access to adoption records.
Title
Regarding access to adoption records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-04-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-04-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-14 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House |