OH HB69 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - To State Government Oversight & Reform
Pending: Senate State Government Oversight & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - To State Government Oversight & Reform
Pending: Senate State Government Oversight & Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4511.095 and to repeal sections 4511.092 and 4511.094 of the Revised Code to prohibit the use of traffic law photo-monitoring devices by municipal corporations, counties, townships, and the State Highway Patrol to detect traffic signal light and speed limit violations, except in certain circumstances.
Title
To prohibit the use of traffic law photo-monitoring devices by municipal corporations, counties, townships, and the State Highway Patrol to detect traffic signal light and speed limit violations, except in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-06-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-25 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-02-20 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 11 | 092 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 094 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 095 | New Code | See Bill Text |