OH HB69 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2317.56, 2919.171, 2919.19, 2919.191, 2919.192, 2919.193, and 4731.22; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 2919.191 (2919.192), 2919.192 (2919.194), and 2919.193 (2919.198); and to enact new sections 2919.191 and 2919.193 and sections 2919.195, 2919.196, 2919.197, 2919.199, 2919.1910, and 2919.1911 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat and to create the Joint Legislative Committee on Adoption Promotion and Support.
Title
Prohibits abortion if detectable heartbeat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-02-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Juvenile and Family Law
State and Local Government : State Government
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Juvenile and Family Law
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |