OH HB7 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3125.18, 3701.61, 3701.611, 5101.342, 5101.35, 5101.80, 5101.801, 5123.0421, 5123.33, 5153.16, 5162.13, and 5162.131 and to enact sections 4723.89, 4723.90, 5101.805, 5101.91, 5104.291, 5120.658, 5164.071, and 5166.45 of the Revised Code to support strong foundations for Ohio mothers and babies in their first one thousand days to address maternal and infant mortality, to improve health, developmental, and learning outcomes for babies and mothers through expanded prenatal, postnatal, infant, and toddler health care and early intervention and wraparound services and supports; to name this act the Strong Foundations Act; and to make appropriations.
Title
Enact the Strong Foundations Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2023-06-07 | House | Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Families and Aging |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to committee: Families and Aging |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Assistance
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Families and Aging Committee
House Finance Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Assistance
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Families and Aging Committee
House Finance Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 25 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 23 | 89 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 342 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 01 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 01 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 01 | 801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 01 | 805 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 01 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 04 | 291 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 20 | 658 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 23 | 0421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 23 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 53 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 62 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 64 | 071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 66 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |