OH HB79 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-10)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 63-10)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective 6/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.71, 109.73, 109.75, 109.79, 109.801, and 2923.126 and to enact sections 109.748 and 109.771 of the Revised Code to provide for firearms training for tactical medical professionals; to permit such a professional who has received that training and has been specifically authorized by the law enforcement agency to carry firearms while on duty; and to grant such a professional the same right to carry a concealed handgun in this state as a concealed handgun licensee.
Title
Provide for firearms training for tactical medical professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Effective 6/1/18 | |
2018-02-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-11 | House | Passed |
2017-09-13 | House | Reported: Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2017-02-28 | House | Refer to Committee: Federalism and Interstate Relations |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 71 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 748 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 09 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 771 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 09 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |