OH HB79 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Effective 6/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To make appropriations for the Industrial Commission for the biennium beginning July 1, 2019, and ending June 30, 2021, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of Commission programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates FY 2020-2021 Industrial Commission budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Effective 6/27/19
2019-06-19SenatePassed
2019-06-19SenateReported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-06SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-04SenateIntroduced
2019-05-30HousePassed
2019-05-30HouseReported: Finance
2019-03-12HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-03-06HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2019-02-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-79
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb79/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-79

Bill Comments

feedback