OH HB9 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-10-18 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-10-18 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 4501.01, 4507.03, 4511.01, 4511.202, 4513.11, and 4513.99 of the Revised Code to require farm machinery that is designed by its manufacturer to operate at a speed greater than 25 miles per hour to display a speed identification symbol and a slow-moving vehicle emblem when operated on a road or highway and to further address the operation of such farm machinery on roads and highways.
Title
Farm machinery - road & highway operation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-18 | Effective Date | |
2007-07-19 | Governor Action | |
2007-07-23 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-07-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-06-27 | Concurrence | |
2007-06-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-06-26 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-08 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2007-05-08 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-05-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-04-19 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To Infrastructure, Homeland Security & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_9 |