OH SB115 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1751.85, 1753.09, 3901.21, 3923.86, 3963.01, 3963.02, 3963.03, and 4715.30 of the Revised Code regarding limitations imposed by health insurers on dental care services.
Title
Regards limitations imposed by health insurers on dental care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-11-16 | House | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Reported: Insurance |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Insurance
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Insurance Committee
Senate Insurance Committee
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Insurance Committee
Senate Insurance Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 51 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 53 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |