OH SB154 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 122.925, 124.23, 145.30, 742.52, 742.521, 2151.4210, 3307.75, 3309.02, 3313.471, 3319.085, 3511.01, 4731.36, 4743.041, 5505.16, 5747.01, 5903.01, 5903.02, 5907.01, 5907.04, and 5910.01 of the Revised Code to include Space Force in the definition of the armed forces, armed services, and uniformed services of the United States.
Title
Include Space Force in armed forces, armed and uniformed service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 22 | 925 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 24 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 45 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 4210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 07 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 09 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 471 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 085 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 11 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 43 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 05 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 03 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 07 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 07 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 10 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 42 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 42 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |