OH SB179 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5534.70 of the Revised Code to designate the "Lt. Col. Ralph D. Cole Memorial Bridge" within the municipal corporation of Findlay.
Title
Designates memorial bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Hite [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |