OH SB2 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-14 - Effective 2/14/16 - Emergency: effective February 14, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-14 - Effective 2/14/16 - Emergency: effective February 14, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5701.11 of the Revised Code to expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since April 1, 2015, into Ohio law, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Incorporates Internal Revenue Code changes into Ohio law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-14 | Effective 2/14/16 - Emergency: effective February 14, 2016 | |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-01-27 | House | Passed |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2015-02-18 | House | To committee: Ways and Means |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 01 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |