OH SB28 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Effective 8/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Effective 8/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 1533.05 of the Revised Code to authorize the use of owls in the sport of falconry.
Title
Authorizes the use of owls in the sport of falconry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Effective 8/10/21 | |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 33 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |