OH SB372 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 197.01, 197.03, 197.04, 197.05, 197.06, 197.07, 197.08, 197.11, 197.12, and 197.13 of the Revised Code to create the Holocaust and Genocide Memorial and Education Commission.
Title
Create Holocaust and Genocide Memorial and Education Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2020-11-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 97 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 97 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |