OH SB58 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to committee: Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 9.68 of the Revised Code to prohibit requiring fees or firearms liability insurance for the possession of firearms, or fees for the possession of knives.
Title
Prohibit requiring firearms liability insurance or certain fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to committee: Insurance |
2023-05-01 | House | Introduced |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
House Insurance Committee
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
State and Local Government : Local Government
House Insurance Committee
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
State and Local Government : Local Government